This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2017 at 05:54:51 (UTC).

AMERICAN POOL CONSTRUCTION, INC. VS HAIM SHIRI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 AMERICAN POOL CONSTRUCTION, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAIM SHIRI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1110

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN POOL CONSTRUCTION INC.

27902 Ruggie Rd

Sun City, CA 92585

Defendants

DIAMOND BUILDERS INC. DBA DIAMOND HOME BUILDERS INC.

5725 Bertrand Ave

Encino, CA 91316

SHIRI HAIM

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/20/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

3/20/2017: Notice of Postponement

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/2/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/22/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 05/22/2017

5/22/2017: Minute Order of 05/22/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/22/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 05/22/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 05/22/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 05/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Notice of Postponement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Request for Postponement - CCP 116.570; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0010809 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: American Pool Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0009239 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Fee (per page) - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: VE-2017-0009239 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Invoice: Facsimile Filing Verification Fee - CRC 10.815; LOCAL RULE 2.22; Fee: $4.50; Payment: 4.50 Receipt: VE-2017-0009239 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: American Pool Construction, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Haim Shiri (Defendant); Diamond Builders, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIAMOND BUILDERS INC. is a litigant