This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2019 at 01:57:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION VS FRANCO ARANGURE

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANCO ARANGURE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4904

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION

6 Pointe Dr Suite 400

Brea, CA 92821

Defendant

ARANGURE FRANCO

Cypress, CA 90630

Assignee

MCT GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

MORRIS AIMEE ROBSON

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/18/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

4/22/2019: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/12/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/12/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

4/23/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (los angeles)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/1/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/12/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/12/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

4/22/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Appointment of Attorney - Appointment of Attorney

4/22/2019: Appointment of Attorney - Appointment of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Assignment of Judgment: As To Parties changed from American First Credit Union (Plaintiff) to American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: MCT GROUP (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: MCT GROUP (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: MCT GROUP (Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest: As To Parties changed from Franco Arangure (Defendant) to Franco Arangure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Writ of Execution (los angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: los angeles; Principal: 2,176.54; Interest: 73.75; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Assignment of Judgment; Filed by: MCT GROUP (Assignee); American First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/12/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff American First Credit Union against Defendant Franco Arangure on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by American First Credit Union on 10/01/2018 for the principal amount of $2,061.54 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,176.54.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/12/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Franco Arangure (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Franco Arangure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Franco Arangure (Defendant) to Franco Arangure (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.