This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2020 at 10:50:15 (UTC).

AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION VS DANNY PARK

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANNY PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4899

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN FIRST CREDIT UNION

6 Pointe Dr Suite 400

Brea, CA 92821

Defendant

PARK DANNY

Los Angeles, CA 90004

Assignee

MCT GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

MORRIS AIMEE ROBSON

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/25/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/18/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Appointment of Attorney - Appointment of Attorney

9/25/2019: Appointment of Attorney - Appointment of Attorney

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/1/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

4/29/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

9/25/2019: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/11/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/11/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

8/2/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

9/26/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: Danny Park (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Assignment of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Danny Park (Defendant) to American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Appointment of Attorney: As To Parties: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 2,615.00; Interest: 95.14; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: MCT GROUP (Assignee); As to: Danny Park (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketAppointment of Attorney; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: MCT GROUP (Assignee); As to: Danny Park (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 95.14; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued and Filed by: Clerk; As to: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Roseeffective 02/04/2019; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/11/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff American First Credit Union against Defendant Danny Park on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by American First Credit Union on 10/01/2018 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,615.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/11/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Park (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: American First Credit Union (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Park (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.