Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2021 at 09:28:31 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6362

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK AKA AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

HARUTYUNYAN AN INDIVIDUAL LIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/28/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/9/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 11/09/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/17/2020; Service Cost: 94.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: LIANA HARUTYUNYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less