Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 16:19:49 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK VS HILDA TAHMASIAN

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HILDA TAHMASIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7286

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

TAHMASIAN HILDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALDARO AARON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/22/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/22/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Default Judgment

11/25/2019: Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/2/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

9/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK against Defendant HILDA TAHMASIAN on the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 09/19/2019 for the principal amount of $13,897.66 and costs of $456.75 for a total of $14,354.41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to HILDA TAHMASIAN; On the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK on 09/19/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant); Service Date: 09/27/2019; Service Cost: 68.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (Plaintiff); As to: HILDA TAHMASIAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 09/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less