Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 13:48:44 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB VS ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6341

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

KAREPETYAN INDIVIDUALLY ASHKHEN AKA ELITE SMOKESHOP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/10/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Complaint - Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/9/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/9/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • Hearing11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/21/2020; Service Cost: 94.20; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK,FSB (Plaintiff); As to: ASHKHEN KAREPETYAN, INDIVIDUALLY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M