Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 04:13:56 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS MI S SEON

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MI S SEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1917

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LILLIAN VEGA JACOBS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

SEON MI S AKA MI SEON AKA MI SOOK SEON AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/20/2020

10/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/20/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/20/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • Hearing03/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 10/20/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 03/28/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lillian Vega Jacobs in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff); As to: MI S SEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff); As to: MI S SEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff); As to: MI S SEON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less