Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 01:49:31 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB VS FRANK WEIGAND

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANK WEIGAND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6709

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

WEIGAND FRANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL LINA M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - No Service

1/16/2018: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

2/14/2018: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

2/16/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

10/27/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/27/2017: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/27/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/27/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff); As to: FRANK WEIGAND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M