This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 01:29:23 (UTC).

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY VS MARCOS SOLIS SOLANO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARCOS SOLIS SOLANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2047

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

VORTEX TRUCKING INC.

SOLANO MARCOS SOLIS AKA MARCOS SOLIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON SUSAN M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/14/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

3/10/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

5/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continued Trial

8/31/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continued Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Answer - Answer

6/25/2020: Answer - Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continued Trial; Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Marcos Solis Solano (Defendant); Vortex Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 07/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 11/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 05/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 05/11/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for 05/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Vortex Trucking, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/06/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Marcos Solis Solano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Marcos Solis Solano (Defendant); Vortex Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Marcos Solis Solano (Defendant); Vortex Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amco Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Marcos Solis Solano (Defendant); Vortex Trucking, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC02047    Hearing Date: May 11, 2021    Dept: 26

AMCO Ins. Co. v. Solano, et al.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:  

Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Marcos Solis Solano aka Marcos Solis is GRANTED. DEFENDANT MARCOS SOLIS SOLANO AKA MARCOS SOLIS IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $210.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. 

ANALYSIS:

On December 16, 2020, Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Marcos Solis Solano aka Marcos Solis (“Defendant Solano”). (Motion, Taylor Decl., Exh. 1.) Despite meet and confer efforts, Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant Solano to date. (Id. at ¶¶4-7 and Exh. 2.) Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted and Request for Sanctions on March 10, 2021. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Defendant Solano has not served verified responses to the discovery propounded on December 16, 2020 as of the filing of the Motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Sanctions are required under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. Sanctions are granted against Defendant Solano in the amount of $210.00, based on half-an-hour of attorney time billed at $300.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Taylor Decl., ¶8.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff AMCO Insurance Company’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Marcos Solis Solano aka Marcos Solis is GRANTED. DEFENDANT MARCOS SOLIS SOLANO AKA MARCOS SOLIS IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $210.00 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENSON SUSAN M