This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/07/2020 at 00:48:41 (UTC).

AMANDA LYNN GERBERICH, ET AL. VS KEVIN SHERIDAN

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 AMANDA LYNN GERBERICH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEVIN SHERIDAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4087

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GERBERICH BRAD

GERBERICH AMANDA

GERBERICH BRADLEY

Arcadia, CA 91006

Defendant

K. SHENDAN LANDSCAPE INC.

4556 Miller St.,

La Verne, CA 91750

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/3/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/9/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

5/29/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Order on Request for Court Order

5/29/2018: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/29/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/29/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/29/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

6/29/2018: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/5/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/6/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

8/10/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/14/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request for Court Order and Answer

5/14/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

5/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Notice of Postponement

5/14/2018: Notice of Postponement

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

4/27/2018: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

4/27/2018: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/3/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Unknown

4/9/2018: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

4/3/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 09/05/2018 ; Status Date changed from 06/29/2018 to 09/05/2018 ; Status changed from Vacated to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Amanda Gerberich (Plaintiff); Bradley Gerberich (Plaintiff); As to: K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal) of 06/29/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketTrial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal scheduled for 06/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 06/29/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff Bradley Gerberich and Plaintiff Amanda Gerberich against Defendant K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Amanda Gerberich, et al. on 12/20/2017 for the principal amount of $1,421.00 and costs of $40.00 for a total of $1,461.00.; Other: Court subtracted withheld payment from amount to be awarded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Amanda Gerberich, et al. on 12/20/2017, judgment entered on 04/03/2018 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Amanda Gerberich, et al. on 12/20/2017, judgment entered on 04/03/2018 as to K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Bradley Gerberich (Plaintiff): First Name changed from Brad to Bradley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Amanda Gerberich (Plaintiff); Brad Gerberich (Plaintiff); As to: K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Amanda Gerberich (Plaintiff); Brad Gerberich (Plaintiff); As to: K. Shendan Landscape, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/03/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Amanda Lynn Gerberich (Plaintiff); Brad Kent Gerberich (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Sheridan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less