This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 06:41:41 (UTC).

AMANDA FLORES VS JESSICA ANN HIDEBRANDT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 AMANDA FLORES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JESSICA ANN HIDEBRANDT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8897

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES AMANDA

Defendants

FLORES DONNA MARIE

HIDEBRANDT JESSICA ANN

VILLAFONA JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWLES RICHARD JOSEPH

Defendant Attorneys

GLADSTEIN AARON

GLADSTEIN AARON M

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

5/3/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

5/3/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer First Amended

5/4/2021: Answer - Answer First Amended

Answer - Answer Second Amended

5/4/2021: Answer - Answer Second Amended

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to: (1) Set Aside Default of Defendant Jorge Villafana, (2) Withdraw Plaintifff's Demurrer/Motion to Strike in Response to An

4/12/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation to: (1) Set Aside Default of Defendant Jorge Villafana, (2) Withdraw Plaintifff's Demurrer/Motion to Strike in Response to An

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/5/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/3/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/8/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/8/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/8/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/21/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/21/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/21/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer Second Amended; Filed by: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); As to: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer First Amended; Filed by: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); Donna Marie Flores (Defendant); Jorge Villafona (Defendant); As to: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Aaron M Gladstein (Attorney): Organization Name: BOREN, OSHER & LUFTMAN, LLP; Middle Name: M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); Donna Marie Flores (Defendant); Jorge Villafona (Defendant); As to: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); Donna Marie Flores (Defendant); Jorge Villafona (Defendant); As to: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order Stipulation to: (1) Set Aside Default of Defendant Jorge Villafana, (2) Withdraw Plaintifff's Demurrer/Motion to Strike in Response to Answers; (3) Dismiss Small Claims Action; (4) Allow Filing of Responsive Pleadings on Behalf of All Defendants; and [Pr; Signed and Filed by: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); Donna Marie Flores (Defendant); Jorge Villafona (Defendant); As to: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Villafona (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Ann Hidebrandt (Defendant); Donna Marie Flores (Defendant); Jorge Villafona (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Amanda Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC08897    Hearing Date: April 12, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., April 12, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Flores v. Hildebrandt, et al. COMPL. FILED: 10-21-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC08897 DISC. C/O: 03-21-22

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 04-05-22

TRIAL DATE: 04-20-22

PROCEEDINGS: DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS’ ANSWERS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Amanda Flores, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: None

DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE

(CCP § 430.10, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

To allow the Court sufficient time to review the pending Stipulation filed on March 8, 2021 that would resolve the instant Demurrer and Motion to Strike, the hearing is CONTINUED TO MAY 27, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of April 7, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of April 7, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On October 21, 2020, Plaintiff Amanda Flores (“Plaintiff”), in pro per, filed an action against Jessica Ann Hildebrandt (“Hildebrandt”), Donna Marie Flores (“Flores”) and Jorge Villafona (“Villafona”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Defendant Hildebrandt filed an Answer, in pro per, on December 22, 2020 and Defendant Flores filed her Answer, in pro per, on January 25, 2021. Following his failure to respond, default was entered against Defendant Villafona on January 21, 2021. Defendant Hildebrandt filed an Amended Answer on January 25, 2021. Defendant Villafona attempted to file an Answer, in pro per, on January 25, 2021 despite being in default.

On February 8, 2021, Plaintiff filed the instant Demurrer and Motion to Strike Defendant Hildebrandt’s Answer, Defendant Flores’ Answer, and Defendant Villafona’s Answer (the “Motion”).

Plaintiff filed a substitution of attorney indicating she is represented by attorney Richard Cowles on March 3, 2021. On March 5, 2021, Defendants Hildebrandt, Flores, and Villafona also filed a substitution of attorney indicating Aaron M. Gladstein is representing them in this action.

On March 8, 2021, Defendants filed a Stipulation (1) to set aside the default of Defendant Villafona, (2) to withdraw Plaintiff’s Demurrer and Motion to Strike, (3) to dismiss Small Claims Action, and (4) to allow the filing of responsive pleadings on behalf of all Defendants (the “Stipulation”).

Because the Stipulation would resolve the pending Demurrer and Motion to Strike, the instant hearing is CONTINUED to allow the Court sufficient time to review the pending Stipulation.

  1. Conclusion & Order

To allow the Court sufficient time to review the pending Stipulation filed on March 8, 2021 that would resolve the instant Demurrer and Motion to Strike, the hearing is CONTINUED TO MAY 27, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWLES RICHARD J.