This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:06:04 (UTC).

ALYSSA FLORES VS DANIEL ADRIAN FLORES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 ALYSSA FLORES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANIEL ADRIAN FLORES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3945

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Defendants

FLORES DANIEL ADRIAN

Long Beach, CA 90805

FLORES RAUL

Long Beach, CA 90805

LOPEZ FRANCISCA

Long Beach, CA 90805

Not Classified By Court

FLORES ISELA

Compton, CA 90222

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2019

2/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/11/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

10/11/2018: Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/11/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/18/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

8/22/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem]

8/23/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/14/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alyssa Flores on 08/14/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/08/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Notice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Daniel Adrian Flores (Defendant); Francisca Lopez (Defendant); Raul Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/08/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/08/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Francisca Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/11/2018; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Raul Flores (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/11/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Adrian Flores (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court, Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by: Isela Flores (Non-Party); As to: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alyssa Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Adrian Flores (Defendant); Francisca Lopez (Defendant); Raul Flores (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less