This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2019 at 00:39:20 (UTC).

ALVIN PAEZ VS SANDRA Y. Y. LEVENTHAL

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 ALVIN PAEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SANDRA Y Y LEVENTHAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8343

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAEZ ALVIN

Defendants

LEVENTHAL SANDRA Y. Y.

ROSENBLATT RUTH L.

SASKE EDELLE

LEVENTHAL SANDRA Y.

ROSENBLATT RUTH L. AS TRUSTEE OF THE RUTH L. ROSENBLATT 2004 TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

15720 Ventura Blvd Ste 228

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorney

FIDLER GARY DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

9/12/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/28/2019: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/7/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/21/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/13/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

11/27/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice to Attend Trial

1/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice to Attend Trial

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

1/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/16/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

9/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/20/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/20/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alvin Paez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff); As to: Ruth L. Rosenblatt, as Trustee of the Ruth L. Rosenblatt 2004 Trust (Defendant); Ruth L. Rosenblatt (Defendant); Edelle Saske (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Ruth L. Rosenblatt, as Trustee of the Ruth L. Rosenblatt 2004 Trust (Defendant); Ruth L. Rosenblatt (Defendant); Edelle Saske (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, Default entered on 03/21/2019, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, Default entered on 03/21/2019, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018 Default entered on 03/13/2019, Vacated as to Ruth L. Rosenblatt - stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, Default entered on 03/13/2019, Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, Default entered on 05/28/2019, Vacated - stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- On the Complaint filed by Alvin Paez on 06/20/2018, judgment entered on 06/20/2019 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Y. Y. Leventhal (Defendant); Service Date: 07/26/2018; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alvin Paez (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Y. Y. Leventhal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08343    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Sandra Y. Leventhal as Trustee of the Leventhal Revocable Trust, Edelle Saske, and Ruth L. Rosenblatt, individually and as Trustee of the Ruth L. Rosenblatt 2004 Trust’s Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT.

Discussion

On September 12, 2019, Defendants Sandra Y. Leventhal as Trustee of the Leventhal Revocable Trust, Edelle Saske, and Ruth L. Rosenblatt, individually and as Trustee of the Ruth L. Rosenblatt 2004 Trust (collectively, “Defendants”) filed a Motion to Vacate Default and Default Judgment (the “Motion”). But on September 23, Defendants filed a Stipulation to Vacate Default and Default Judgment, which is signed by both parties. Accordingly, the Motion will be MOOT upon the Court’s signing of the Stipulation.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the stated reasons, the Motion is DENIED AS MOOT.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCdept94@lacourt.org as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion will be placed off calendar.