This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/15/2016 at 06:18:57 (UTC).

ALMARON MANAGEMENT VS YANEZ, DIEGO

Case Summary

On 11/06/2013 ALMARON MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against YANEZ, DIEGO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3852

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALMARON MANAGEMENT

Defendants

YANEZ DIEGO

TORRES MICHELLE IRENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, ALLEN R

Defendant Attorney

SHIPITSYNA, SARAH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2014
  • MEMO OF COSTS (SUMMARY) $520.40 (FOR DIEGO YANEZ); FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 01/17/13 AT 09:00 A M IN DEPT. 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2013
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 01/15/14 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/27/13, 08:30 AM, DEPT 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • JURY DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • AMENDED ANSWER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • OSC SET 05/05/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 94 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALMARON MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIPITSYNA, SARAH