Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 12:53:28 (UTC).

ALLY FINANCIAL INC., A CORPORATION VS CINDY BUSTAMANTE, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 ALLY FINANCIAL INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CINDY BUSTAMANTE, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3128

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY FINANCIAL INC. A CORPORATION

Defendant

BUSTAMANTE AN INDIVIDUAL CINDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICHAEL DONALD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/21/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

2/13/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/20/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

11/20/2017: Application for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Delivery scheduled for 03/06/2018 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Hearing on Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Delivery: Location changed from Department 82 to Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Cindy Bustamante, an individual (Defendant); Service Date: 02/05/18; Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Delivery scheduled for 03/06/2018 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 82

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession (Claim and Delivery); Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/21/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Cindy Bustamante, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ally Financial Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D