Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2019 at 06:12:43 (UTC).

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY VS JOSEPH BRUCE RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY against JOSEPH BRUCE RODRIGUEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1596

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLSTATE NORTHBROOK INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ JOSEPH BRUCE

 

Court Documents

Summons - on Complaint

9/10/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/10/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/10/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/10/2018: Complaint

Answer - Answer

10/23/2018: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • Answer; Filed by: Joseph Bruce Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Bruce Rodriguez (Defendant); Service Date: 09/22/2018; Service Cost: 99.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph Bruce Rodriguez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less