This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 17:19:47 (UTC).

ALLISON NICOLE CEDILLOS, ET AL. VS WALTER JAMES LINDSEY

Case Summary

On 10/22/2018 ALLISON NICOLE CEDILLOS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WALTER JAMES LINDSEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3025

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTAMARIA LIJIA

Defendant

LINDSEY WALTER JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial)

5/14/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/9/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

12/9/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

7/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

7/16/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim - Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Allison

11/27/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Allison

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/13/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/22/2018: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Hearing02/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Non-Jury Trial) of 05/14/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 02/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/22/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Signed and Filed by: Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria (Plaintiff); As to: Walter James Lindsey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Signed and Filed by: Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria (Plaintiff); As to: Walter James Lindsey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria (Plaintiff): Last Name changed from Cedillos to Cedillos Santamaria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Allison; Signed and Filed by: Lijia Santamaria (Plaintiff); As to: Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Allison Nicole Cedillos (Plaintiff); Lijia Santamaria (Plaintiff); As to: Walter James Lindsey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Allison Nicole Cedillos (Plaintiff); Lijia Santamaria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC13025    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Santamaria v. Lindsey, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Lijia Santamaria on behalf of Minor Claimant Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Claim is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

On July 16, 2019, minor Plaintiff Allison Nicole Cedillos Santamaria (“Claimant”), by and through her Guardian ad Litem, Lijia Santamaria (“Petitioner”), filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor with respect to injuries Claimant sustained as a result of motor vehicle accident involving Walter James Lindsey (“Defendant”).

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372.) “When a minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, or a person for whom a conservator has been appointed is a party, that person shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, subd. (a)(1).)

A review of the Petition indicates that it is reasonable and provides Claimant with a reasonable settlement in light of the injuries sustained and medical expenses incurred. Order to Deposit Money into Blocked Account on Judicial Council Form MC-355 and Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action on Judicial Council Form MC-351 have been filed.

Therefore, the Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action on Behalf of Minor is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.