Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/31/2021 at 09:10:37 (UTC).

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JONES BUILDERS GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 ALLIED ROOFING WATERPROOFING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JONES BUILDERS GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0490

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

JONES BUILDERS GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A CORPORATION

QUAKER BEACH PROPERTIES

BRUCE FELDMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAKER BEACH PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOEB STEVEN S

Defendant Attorney

SOSA CARLOS

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Lis Pendens

2/11/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Lis Pendens

General Denial - General Denial

1/20/2021: General Denial - General Denial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/29/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/5/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

1/5/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/17/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/17/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/17/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2023
  • Hearing12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Hearing06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice Withdrawal of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jones Builders Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Bruce Feldman as Trustee of the Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant); Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jones Builders Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/31/2020; Service Cost: 164.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/24/2020; Service Cost: 62.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 12/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Bruce Feldman as Trustee of the Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Quaker Beach Properties to Bruce Feldman as Trustee of the Quaker Beach Properties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Status Date changed from 12/29/2020 to 12/29/2020; Result Date changed from 12/31/2020 to 12/31/2020; As To Parties changed from Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant) to Bruce Feldman as Trustee of the Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jones Builders Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant); Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jones Builders Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant); Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Allied Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Jones Builders Group, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Quaker Beach Properties (Defendant); Western Surety Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED ROOFING & WATERPROOFING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E