This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:10:38 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY VS VICTORIA RENTERIA RAMOS

Case Summary

On 12/01/2017 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against VICTORIA RENTERIA RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4861

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

RAMOS VICTORIA RENTERIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

BUCK SEAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/27/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to continue Trial and Related Motion/Discovery date;

5/29/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to continue Trial and Related Motion/Discovery date;

Answer

1/22/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

1/22/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

12/21/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/1/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

12/1/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/1/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to continue Trial and Related Motion/Discovery date;; Filed by: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant); As to: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation to continue Trial and Related Motion/Discovery date;: Filed By: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 05/29/2019; As To Parties changed from Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff) to Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/07/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury; Filed by: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant); Service Date: 12/09/2017; Service Cost: 54.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Victoria Renteria Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC04861    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY,

Plaintiff,

v.

VICTORIA RENTERIA RAMOS, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 17STLC04861

[Related to Lead Case 19STCV30896]

Hearing Date: December 19, 2019

[Tentative] order RE:

MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

On December 1, 2017, Plaintiff Alliance United Insurance Company filed a complaint against Defendant Victoria Renteria Ramos for automobile subrogation. On October 4, 2019, the Court found this action was related to LASC Case Number 19STCV30896. However, the cases were never consolidated. Then, on November 7, 2019, no party appeared for trial in the above-referenced case, so it was dismissed. Now, the parties seek to reinstate the above-referenced case pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 473(b), and they have stipulated to consolidate the cases for trial. Plaintiff’s counsel states that his office retained counsel to appear for trial but neglected to tell him that the case had been transferred from Department 94 to Department 5, so he failed to appear. (Tapper Decl., ¶ 5.) The motion is unopposed. Therefore, the motion is granted, and the above-referenced case is reinstated.

The Court also grants the parties’ stipulation to consolidate the two cases. LASC Case Number 19STCV30896 shall be the lead case, and all pleadings shall be filed in that case. Plaintiff shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: December 19, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court