This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 12:46:26 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY VS SHIN, JUNE WOO

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHIN, JUNE WOO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7801

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SHIN JUNE WOO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD F HAINES

Defendant Attorneys

HOUTZ RICHARD SCOTT

JOHNSON JERRY LEE

 

Court Documents

Summons

6/19/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/19/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Auto

6/19/2017: Complaint - Auto

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

8/15/2017: Answer

Notice of Related Case

8/15/2017: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case;)

8/30/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 09/15/2017

9/15/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 09/15/2017

Minute Order - (Final Status Conference)

9/15/2017: Minute Order - (Final Status Conference)

Minute Order - (Trial Setting Conference)

10/18/2017: Minute Order - (Trial Setting Conference)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUT OFF DATES

3/14/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND CUT OFF DATES

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

9/26/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order for entry of judgment and installment payments

9/27/2018: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order for entry of judgment and installment payments

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

10/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018

10/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018

Notice (name extension) - Notice of order to show cause hearing

10/30/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice of order to show cause hearing

Substitution of Attorney

12/3/2018: Substitution of Attorney

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of order to show cause hearing; Filed by: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 10/15/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY on 06/19/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order for entry of judgment and installment payments; Signed and Filed by: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 09/26/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 09/26/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JUNE WOO SHIN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/24/2017; Service Cost: 55.61; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/26/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 06/19/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - AUTO Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17K07801    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 26

Alliance United Ins. Co. v. Shin, et al.

ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND ENTER JUDGMENT

(CCP § 664.6)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Alliance United Insurance Company’s second Motion to Enforce Settlement is GRANTED. Plaintiff is entitled to entry of judgment pursuant to Section 664.6 in the amount of $10,899.16 principal, interest of $2,397.82 based on the rate of 10% per annum from February 11, 2013, and $425.61 costs.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Alliance United Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant June Woo Shin (“Defendant”) on June 19, 2017. On September 27, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Stipulation and Order for Entry of Judgment. The Stipulation was signed into order by the Court on October 15, 2018, with express retention of jurisdiction under Code of Civil Procedure section 664.6. The Court then dismissed the action.

On September 5, 2019, Plaintiff filed the first Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Judgment (the “first Motion”) on the grounds that Defendant had failed to fulfill his obligations under the Settlement Agreement. The hearing on the first Motion was placed off calendar after Plaintiff failed to demonstrate proper service of the moving papers.

On December 16, 2019, Plaintiff filed the second Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enter Judgment (“the Second Motion”). The hearing was initially scheduled for June 18, 2020 and continued to August 6, 2020 due to the COVID-19 pandemic. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Legal Standard

Under Code of Civil Procedure, section 664.6:

If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 664.6.) Strict compliance with the statutory requirements is necessary before a court can enforce a settlement agreement under this statute. (Sully-Miller Contracting Co. v. Gledson/Cashman Construction, Inc. (2002) 103 Cal.App.4th 30, 37.) Accordingly, “parties” under section 664.6 means the litigants themselves, not their attorneys. (Levy v. Superior Court (1995) 10 Cal.4th 578, 586 (holding “we conclude that the term ‘parties’ as used in section 664.6 means the litigants themselves, and does not include their attorneys of record.”).) Additionally, the settlement must include the signatures of the parties seeking to enforce the agreement, and against whom enforcement is sought. (J.B.B. Investment Partners, Ltd. v. Fair (2014) 232 Cal.App.4th 974, 985.)

Discussion

Plaintiff has complied with the statutory requirements set forth above. (Motion, Tapper Decl., Exh. A.) The settlement agreement and request for retention of jurisdiction were signed by both Plaintiff and Defendant and presented to the Court prior to dismissal of the action. The settlement provides that Defendant would pay the sum of $8,000.00 to Plaintiff in monthly installments starting July 2, 2018. (Id. at Exh. A, ¶2.) The settlement agreement also provides that upon Defendant’s default, Plaintiff may move for entry of judgment in the amount of the demand of the Complaint ($S17,899.16) plus interest and costs, but less payments made. (Id. at ¶¶1, 5.) Payments of $7,000.00 were made towards the stipulated judgment, after which Defendant defaulted. (Id. at ¶5.)

Accordingly, Plaintiff Alliance United Insurance Company’s second Motion to Enforce Settlement GRANTED. Plaintiff is entitled to entry of judgment pursuant to Section 664.6 in the amount of $10,899.16 principal, interest of $2,397.82 based on the rate of 10% per annum from February 11, 2013; and $425.61 costs. (Id. at ¶6 and Exh. A.)

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON JERRY LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Houtz, R. Scott