Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2021 at 00:39:46 (UTC).

ALLA KOTOVNIKOVA VS BENJAMIN ARTHUR SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 ALLA KOTOVNIKOVA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BENJAMIN ARTHUR SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2985

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOTOVNIKOVA ALLA

Defendant

SMITH BENJAMIN ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARPEL DONALD

Defendant Attorney

KANG STEVE ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel

3/5/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition

3/22/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition

3/22/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents Per Court Order to Defendants Opposition

3/22/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Supplemental Documents Per Court Order to Defendants Opposition

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

10/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

10/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/7/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

10/7/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Olga N. Troshchiy in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/7/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

10/7/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/7/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Answer - Answer

7/17/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

7/17/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Complaint - Complaint

4/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/3/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Hearing05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 05/19/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition; Filed by: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant); As to: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Supplemental Documents to Defendants Opposition; Filed by: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant); As to: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant); Service Date: 05/21/2020; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alla Kotovnikova (Plaintiff); As to: Benjamin Arthur Smith (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC02985    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Mon., March 22, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Kotovnikova v. Smith COMPL. FILED: 04-03-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC02985 DISC. C/O: 09-01-21

NOTICE:   OK DISC. MOT. C/O:    09-16-21

TRIAL DATE: 10-01-21

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT’S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY:   Plaintiff Alla Kotovnikova

RESP. PARTY: Defendant Benjamin A. Smith

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Alla Kotovnikova’s Motion to Compel Defendant’s Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is CONTINUED TO MAY 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve supplemental papers as requested herein.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on March 5, 2021 [   ] Late [   ] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 17, 2021 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 3, 2020, Plaintiff Alla Kotovnikova (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Benjamin Arthur Smith (“Defendant”). Defendant filed an Answer on July 17, 2020.

On October 7, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Defendant’s Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions (the “Motion”). Defendant filed an Opposition on March 5, 2021. No reply brief has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

A. Request for Production

 

A party must respond to interrogatories and requests for production of documents within 30 days after service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom requests for production of documents are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting party may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (c).) The party also waives the right to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product protection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (a).) There is no time limit for a motion to compel responses to interrogatories or production of documents other than the cut-off on hearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2024.020, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300.) No meet and confer efforts are required before filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300; Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 411.) 

Plaintiff provides evidence that it served a Demand for Production of Documents, Set One, on Defendant’s counsel on August 21, 2020 via email at skang@mercuryinsurance.com. (Mot., Troshchiy Decl., ¶ 2, Exh. 3.) Plaintiff’s counsel sent an email to Defendant’s counsel at the same email address on September 29, 2020 advising that no responses to the propounded discovery had been received and requesting responses without objections “as soon as possible.” (Id. at ¶ 4, Exh. 4.) As of the date this Motion was filed, Plaintiff had not received any discovery responses. (Id. at ¶ 6.)

In Opposition, Defendant argues the Motion is moot because it served complete responses without objections on October 19, 2020 via email. (Oppo., Kang Decl., ¶ 9, Exh. F.) As evidence, Defendant attached a copy of an October 19, 2020 email. (Id.) However, this email does not clearly reference Plaintiff’s discovery requests. Defendant also did not attach copies of its discovery responses with proofs of service to his Opposition. Because Plaintiff did not file a reply brief confirming or disputing receipt of the discovery responses, the Court cannot confirm responses were served and thus cannot determine whether the Motion is moot. Thus, Defendant is ordered to file and serve supplemental papers demonstrating he served discovery responses on October 19.

The parties’ requests for sanctions will be addressed at the following hearing.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Alla Kotovnikova’s Motion to Compel Defendant’s Responses to Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Request for Sanctions is CONTINUED TO MAT 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Defendant must file and serve supplemental papers as requested herein.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANG STEVE A