This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 07:27:10 (UTC).

ALL COAST TERMITE CO. VS FRANKLIN HOLDING LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 ALL COAST TERMITE CO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRANKLIN HOLDING LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7952

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALL COAST TERMITE CO.

3833 Gilman Rd,

El Monte, CA 91732

Defendant

FRANKLIN HOLDING LLC

11620 Wilshire Blvd #900,

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/01/2018

3/1/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/01/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/1/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/4/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/4/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

10/4/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

10/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/8/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

8/8/2017: Notice - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

8/8/2017: Notice - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/01/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 03/01/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 03/01/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: all coast termite co. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: all coast termite co. (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in at Department SE2 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Party to 12/04/2017 08:30 AM at 12/04/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: all coast termite co. (Plaintiff); As to: FRANKLIN HOLDING LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FRANKLIN HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL COAS TERMITE COMPANY is a litigant