This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 11:28:53 (UTC).

ALICIA AGUILAR VS ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC DBA CURACAO

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 ALICIA AGUILAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC DBA CURACAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1694

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR ALICIA

Defendant

ADIR INTERNATIONAL LLC DBA CURACAO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEARGIN COLE WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

HORN ELIZABETH VAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

6/2/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

8/7/2020: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

2/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/20/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for Cole William Yeargin (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ALICIA AGUILAR on 02/20/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by ALICIA AGUILAR as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ALICIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff); As to: ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC dba CURACAO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/10/2020; Service Cost: 104.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC dba CURACAO (Defendant); As to: ALICIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALICIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff); As to: ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC dba CURACAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALICIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff); As to: ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC dba CURACAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALICIA AGUILAR (Plaintiff); As to: ADIR INTERNATIONAL, LLC dba CURACAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADIR INTERNATIONAL LLC DBA CURACAO is a litigant