This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2021 at 16:45:44 (UTC).

ALI LEO VS ISAAC DORIAN ARRIEGADA

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 ALI LEO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ISAAC DORIAN ARRIEGADA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0781

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEO ALI

Defendant

ARRIEGADA ISAAC DORIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AYRAPETYAN EDWIN

TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Ali Leo on 01/04/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Ali Leo as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAddress for Arutyun Topchyan (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Ali Leo (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Dorian Arriegada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ali Leo (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Dorian Arriegada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ali Leo (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Dorian Arriegada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ali Leo (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Dorian Arriegada (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AYRAPETYAN EDWIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOPCHYAN ARUTYUN