This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 13:05:25 (UTC).

ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC VS LIU, SIAN

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LIU, SIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2745

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

LIU SIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TROUNG TIFFANY D.

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession

8/3/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment

8/3/2017: Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/3/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of (name extension) - Possession

8/10/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/22/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/22/2017: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

9/22/2017: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

10/2/2017: Minute Order - (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/2/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Judgment - Unlawful Detainer, Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)]

10/2/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - [Judgment - Unlawful Detainer, Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)]

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

10/2/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/3/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ - Return

10/3/2017: Writ - Return

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department R - Hon. William D. Dodsoneffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Judgment - Unlawful Detainer, Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1 through 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Minute Order (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) against Defendant (LIU, SIAN) on the Complaint filed by (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) on 07/14/2017 for past rent due in the amount of $2,460.00, holdover damages $2,542.00, attorney fees of $390.12, and costs of $510.00 for a total of $5,902.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 through 10 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) against Defendant (LIU, SIAN) on the Complaint filed by (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) on 07/14/2017 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 88 S. GARFIELD AVENUE #414, ALHAMBRA, CA 91801 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is not cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is not forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: SIAN LIU (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/17/17; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 07/17/17; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; SIAN LIU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Default Judgment; Filed by: (ALHAMBRA HOLDINGS LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAS623737017. Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 01/08/18 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT NEA . .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY D.