This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2021 at 00:02:20 (UTC).

ALFREDO ZUNIGA VS JIMMY IRIBE

Case Summary

On 05/10/2018 ALFREDO ZUNIGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JIMMY IRIBE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7152

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZUNIGA ALFREDO

Defendant

IRIBE JIMMY AKA JAIME IRIBE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WRIGHT DENISE ELIZABETH

SHAPIRO LARA

Defendant Attorney

MAHLSTEDT JOY L

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3/9/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/16/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/16/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Relief as Counsel; Declaration of Lara Shapiro

3/16/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Relief as Counsel; Declaration of Lara Shapiro

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

3/20/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance Hearing Date on Mo...)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Advance Hearing Date on Mo...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance on Motion for Relief as Counsel

3/24/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance on Motion for Relief as Counsel

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion To Compel Plaintiffs Physical Examination

7/20/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Motion To Compel Plaintiffs Physical Examination

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/25/2020: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

8/26/2020: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/1/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

2/21/2019: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

2/21/2019: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

5/10/2018: Complaint

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketAddress for Joy L Mahlstedt (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alfredo Zuniga on 05/10/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alfredo Zuniga as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel PLAINTIFF'S PHYSICAL EXAMINATION scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant); As to: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff); As to: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff); As to: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff); As to: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant); Service Date: 01/24/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff); As to: Jimmy Iribe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alfredo Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC07152    Hearing Date: August 25, 2020    Dept: 26

Zuniga v. Iribe., et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

Lara Shapiro, Esq.’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Alfredo Zuniga is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. THIS RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF CORRECTED, SIGNED ORDERS UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAHLSTEDT JOY