This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:37:33 (UTC).

ALEXIS CERVANTES VS XIOMARA D. VIVAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 ALEXIS CERVANTES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against XIOMARA D VIVAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0302

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G. CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CERVANTES ALEXIS

Defendants

VIVAS XIOMARA D.

VIVASMENDOZA YONY ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

8/31/2018: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

11/8/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/08/2018

11/8/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/08/2018

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

4/24/2019: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

4/24/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

4/30/2019: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer - Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

5/1/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

5/1/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

5/6/2019: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

5/6/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

5/8/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

5/10/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Order (name extension) - The appeal is untimely and is dismissed by court.

6/20/2018: Order (name extension) - The appeal is untimely and is dismissed by court.

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order The appeal is untimely and is dismissed by court.]

6/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order The appeal is untimely and is dismissed by court.]

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

6/14/2018: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/10/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/10/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Alexis Cervantes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Updated -- Order on Request for Court Order: As To Parties changed from Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant) to Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Address for Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Filed By: Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 05/06/2019; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Order on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/06/2019 ; Status Date changed from 05/10/2018 to 05/06/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Updated -- Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alexis Cervantes on 01/16/2018 as follows: Defendant Yony Alexander Vivasmendoza does not owe the plaintiff Alexis Cervantes any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/10/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alexis Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/13/2018; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alexis Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Yony Alexander Vivasmendoza (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/13/2018; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alexis Cervantes (Plaintiff); As to: Xiomara D. Vivas (Defendant); Yony Alexander Vivasmendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less