This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2020 at 05:08:48 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP VS TEMISHA JONES

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TEMISHA JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0413

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP

Defendant

JONES TEMISHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/14/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

1/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Temisha Jones )

1/16/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Temisha Jones )

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

2/11/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/11/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

2/13/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING EXECUTION ...) of 02/24/2020

2/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING EXECUTION ...) of 02/24/2020

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ANY DEFAULT AND TO QUASH ANY WRIT OF POSSESSION/EXECUTION

2/24/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ANY DEFAULT AND TO QUASH ANY WRIT OF POSSESSION/EXECUTION

Minute Order - Minute Order (DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING EXECUTION ...)

2/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING EXECUTION ...)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/24/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date - Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date

2/24/2020: Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date - Order Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Judgment

3/2/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

Order (name extension) - Order Staying Execution of Judgment Setting Hearing

3/5/2020: Order (name extension) - Order Staying Execution of Judgment Setting Hearing

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOrder Staying Execution of Judgment Setting Hearing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) and to Quash any Writ of Possession/Execution scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91 updated: Result Date to 03/03/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOpposition to Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) and to Quash any Writ of Possession/Execution scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT AND ANY DEFAULT AND TO QUASH ANY WRIT OF POSSESSION/EXECUTION; Filed by: Temisha Jones (Defendant); As to: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketOrder Staying Execution of Judgment/Setting Hearing Date; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING EXECUTION OF THE JUDGMENT UNTIL A HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT (DEFAULT AND WRIT, ALSO, IF ANY) AND AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING AND SERVICE OF THE MOTION TO SET ASIDE: Filed By: Temisha Jones (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application for Order Staying Execution of the Judgment Until a Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Filed by: Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Temisha Jones; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Alexandria Housing Partners LP on 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: Temisha Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS L.P. is a litigant