This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 19:50:01 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP VS JAMES THORNE

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAMES THORNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1762

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP

Defendant

THORNE JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN MARC

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/15/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application motion

9/15/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application motion

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

9/15/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Worksheet

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application motion)

9/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application motion)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/20/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/20/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Thorne)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (James Thorne)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/16/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

3/20/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/20/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 10/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Worksheet; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application motion: Filed By: James Thorne (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: 09/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application motion; Filed by: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application motion scheduled for 09/15/2020 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court): As To Parties changed from James Thorne (Defendant) to James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to James Thorne; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Alexandria Housing Partners LP on 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Thorne (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/23/2020; Service Cost: 82.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners LP (Plaintiff); As to: James Thorne (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS L.P. is a litigant