This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2020 at 09:26:34 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA APARTMENTS, LLC, BY ITS AGENT, VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD. VS DONALD ROBERT VASTA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 ALEXANDRIA APARTMENTS, LLC, BY ITS AGENT, VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DONALD ROBERT VASTA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9336

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA APARTMENTS LLC BY ITS AGENT VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD.

Defendant

VASTA DONALD ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALLEN K

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

12/17/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

9/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

9/25/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Donald Robert Vasta)

9/27/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Donald Robert Vasta)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

9/27/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

10/17/2019: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial - Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

10/21/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Possession

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

10/21/2019: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings - Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

10/21/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

10/21/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Filed By: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 12/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Exact Name: Writ of Possession; As To Parties changed from Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant) to Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. against Defendant Donald Robert Vasta on the Complaint filed by Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. on 09/25/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1837 N. Alexandria Avenue #403, Los Angeles, CA 90027 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 28.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/01/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant); Service Date: 10/01/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexandria Apartments, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Donald Robert Vasta (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alexandria Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT