This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2020 at 16:37:35 (UTC).

ALEXANDRIA APARTMENT, LLC, BY ITS AGENT, VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD. VS ALVIN CHARLES

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 ALEXANDRIA APARTMENT, LLC, BY ITS AGENT, VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVIN CHARLES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1915

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRIA APARTMENT LLC BY ITS AGENT VANTAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LTD.

Defendant

CHARLES ALVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALLEN K

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

2/20/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/6/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

12/6/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Alvin Charles)

12/10/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Alvin Charles)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/9/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

1/9/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

1/9/2020: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 02/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Alvin Charles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Charles (Defendant); Service Date: 12/12/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Charles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 12/12/2019; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Alvin Charles; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. on 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. against Defendant Alvin Charles on the Complaint filed by Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. on 12/06/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1837 N Alexandria Ave #203, Los Angeles, CA 90027 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 39.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/14/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Charles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Charles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexandria Apartment, LLC, by its agent, Vantage Asset Management Ltd. (Plaintiff); As to: Alvin Charles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alexandria Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN ALLEN KENT