This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 00:04:24 (UTC).

ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC., A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION VS CORNICEN LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ALEXANDER, WINTON ASSOCIATES INC , A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CORNICEN LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1546

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC. A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION

Defendants

CORNICEN LOGISTICS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

TUXEDO RIDGE ADVENTURE TOURS LLC A NEW YORK LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

508 INTERNATIONAL LLC. A MASSACHUSETTS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MCCORMICK FARMS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP A FOREIGN NORTH CAROLINA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASSAKHIAN HARUTIUN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/13/2021

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/13/2021

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

8/13/2021: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/14/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial;)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial;) of 08/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC., A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION on 02/14/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC., A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CORNICEN LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); 508 INTERNATIONAL, LLC. A MASSACHUSETTS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant); MCCORMICK FARMS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A FOREIGN NORTH CAROLINA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC., A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CORNICEN LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALEXANDER, WINTON & ASSOCIATES INC., A MISSISSIPPI CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: CORNICEN LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alexander, Winton & Associates, Inc., a Mississippi Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASSAKHIAN HARUTIUN