This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2020 at 03:43:51 (UTC).

ALEXANDER ROSALES VS ROSA CASTRO

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 ALEXANDER ROSALES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROSA CASTRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1513

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES ALEXANDER

Defendant

CASTRO ROSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN JEFF A.

Defendant Attorney

JEFFERY JANINE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise)

9/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise)

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/12/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

11/12/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Pro

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/22/2019

11/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 11/22/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...)

3/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...) of 03/05/2020

3/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...) of 03/05/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order: Hearing on Expedited Petitions to Approve Compro...) of 07/01/2019

7/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order: Hearing on Expedited Petitions to Approve Compro...) of 07/01/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order: Hearing on Expedited Petitions to Approve Compro...)

7/1/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order: Hearing on Expedited Petitions to Approve Compro...)

Request (name extension) - Request Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

4/25/2019: Request (name extension) - Request Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

Request (name extension) - Request Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

4/25/2019: Request (name extension) - Request Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgement for Minor or Person with a Disability

Answer - Answer

11/21/2018: Answer - Answer

Summons - on Complaint

10/12/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/25/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/6/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alexander Rosales on 09/06/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alexander Rosales as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 99 on [ln 28, col 22] with Document:76658112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Comp...) of 03/05/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/05/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/05/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketHearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rosa Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexander Rosales (Plaintiff); As to: Rosa Castro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexander Rosales (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC11513    Hearing Date: March 05, 2020    Dept: 26

Rosales v. Castro, et al.

EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISES

OF PENDING ACTION ON BEHALF OF MINOR

(CRC 7.950.5(c)(1))

TENTATIVE RULING:

No tentative ruling to issue at this time. Ruling to depend on what happens at the hearing.

ANALYSIS:

On September 6, 2018, Plaintiffs Alexander Rosales and Irma Rosales and minor Plaintiffs Joshua Rosales and Aiden Rosales, filed the instant action for motor vehicle negligence against Defendant Rosa Castro (“Defendant”). Petitioner Alexander Rosales (“Petitioner”) initially filed expedited petitions to approve compromise with Defendant Rosa Castro (“Defendant”) on behalf of minor Claimants Joshua Rosales and Aiden Rosales on April 25, 2019. However, the Court denied the expedited petitions on September 10, 2019 after finding Petitioner failed to resolve the procedural defects in the expedited petitions identified by the Court at the July 1, 2019 hearing. (See 7/1/19 Minute Order; 9/10/19 Minute Order.)

On November 12, 2019, Petitioner filed these subsequent Expedited Petitions to Approve Compromise (“Expedited Petitions”). The Expedited Petitions came for hearing on November 22, 2019, at which time the Court again found that they were defective in numerous respects. Per Cal. Rules of Court Rule 7.950.5(c)(1), the Court scheduled a hearing on the Expedited Petitions to Approve Compromise February 24, 2020 and ordered Petitioner to file amended petitions and supplemental papers to resolve the defects identified herein.

On February 24, 2020, counsel for Petitioner requested that the Court continue the hearing to be heard concurrently with trial on March 5, 2020. To date, no supplemental papers or amended Expedited Petitions have been filed. Accordingly, no tentative ruling is to issue at this time. The ruling on the Expedited Petitions will depend on what happens at the hearing on March 5, 2020.