This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 01:27:19 (UTC).

ALEXA FARNEMAN VS PATRICIA RAPPA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 ALEXA FARNEMAN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PATRICIA RAPPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7481

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARNEMAN ALEXA

Defendants

PATTY INTERNATIONAL INC. DBA MY LASER LOUNGE

RAPPA PATRICIA

PATTY INTERNATIONAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONARCH JENNIFER ROSE

Defendant Attorney

ANGEL ARTHUR R

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/8/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

10/21/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint - Complaint

8/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/12/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alexa Farneman on 08/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alexa Farneman as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketAddress for Jennifer Rose Monarch (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Patricia Rappa (Defendant); Patty International, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rappa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff); As to: Patty International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rappa (Defendant); Patty International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rappa (Defendant); Patty International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexa Farneman (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Rappa (Defendant); Patty International, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANGEL ARTHUR R. ESQ.