This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2012 at 23:20:07 (UTC).

ALESANDRINI, KATHRYN VS. BATHUM, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 03/12/2012 ALESANDRINI, KATHRYN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BATHUM, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0022

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALESANDRINI KATHRYN

Defendants

BATHUM CHRISTOPHER

MCCORMICK LEE

SPIRIT RECOVERY RANCH LLC

NGUYEN CHARLES M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANFREDI, LEVINE & ECCLES, APC - MATTHEW R. ECCLES

Defendant Attorney

TRUTANICH & ASSOCIATES - DOMINIC J TRUTANCIH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAYFORD PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FORMOTION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TOSTIPULATION . APPLICATION GRANTED. TRIAL DATE CONTINUEDTO 6/1/2012 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 3. THE COURT WILLCONSIDER MOVING THIS DATE TO 6/08/2012 UPON FILING OF ASTIPULATION SIGNED BY ALL PARTIES TO THIS MATTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUETRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED. FILE SENT TODEPT. 003 . RECEIPT # MAL519850002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL FILED BY CHRISTOPHER BATHUM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 003, CMR. H. JAY FORDRE: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL. FORWARDED FOR REVIEW ANDCONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT AND RELOCATION FILED AND MAILED TORESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OFMAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • JURY FEES POSTED BY DOMINIC J TRUTANICH ON BEHALF OF(MCCORMICK, LEE) , IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00, IN TRUST ONRECEIPT # MAL51985007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL HAVING BEEN FILED ON04/10/12 . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 05/04/12 AT08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE LIST AND PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLEADINGSFILED BUT NOT PREVIOUSLY SERVED TO ALL PARTIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (BATHUM, CHRISTOPHER) ,(MCCORMICK, LEE) , (SPIRIT RECOVERY RANCH), LLC , (NGUYEN,CHARLES), M.D. .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVEDAS TO (NGUYEN, CHARLES), M.D. . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (NGUYEN, CHARLES), M.D. . RECEIPT #MAL519850006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BATHUM, CHRISTOPHER) . RECEIPT # FEEWAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BATHUM,CHRISTOPHER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BATHUM,CHRISTOPHER) IS GRANTED BY OPERATION OF LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL519850002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 003 OF HONORABLE CMR. H. JAY FORD .

    Read MoreRead Less