This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2019 at 00:42:39 (UTC).

ALEKSANDR BIBLE VS BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 ALEKSANDR BIBLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2025

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIBLE ALEKSANDR

Defendant

BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/17/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

7/5/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2019

8/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/2/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT]

7/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT]

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/17/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/02/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Aleksandr Bible on 06/17/2019, entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT; Filed by: Aleksandr Bible (Plaintiff); Beach Cities Protective Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice OF THE CLERK OF ALL PARTIES REGARDING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/02/2019 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Aleksandr Bible (Plaintiff); As to: Beach Cities Protective Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Aleksandr Bible (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Aleksandr Bible (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEACH CITIES PROTECTIVE SERVICES INC is a litigant