This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2021 at 10:34:16 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO LEON FLORES VS DANIEL GARCIA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 ALEJANDRO LEON FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9840

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES ALEJANDRO LEON

Defendant

GARCIA DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARDANYAN RUBEN

Defendant Attorney

MACDONALD SCOTT L

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

12/22/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/22/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

12/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alejandro Leon Flores on 11/24/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alejandro Leon Flores as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAddress for Ruben Vardanyan (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Garcia (Defendant); Service Date: 12/01/2020; Service Cost: 96.08; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Daniel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Daniel Garcia (Defendant); As to: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alejandro Leon Flores (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VARDANYAN RUBEN