This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 22:53:19 (UTC).

ALEJANDRO DIAZ VS JUAN REYES

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 ALEJANDRO DIAZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JUAN REYES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8278

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ ALEJANDRO

Defendant

REYES JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

Defendant Attorney

VANANTWERP LESLIE WALKER III

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

8/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice to Attend Trial

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/24/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/10/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

10/24/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

11/5/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

12/2/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

12/5/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/23/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/5/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/24/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Exhibit List - Exhibit List AND WITNESS LIST

5/25/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List AND WITNESS LIST

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Reginald Carlton

7/30/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Reginald Carlton

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

8/14/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Summons - on Complaint

6/6/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/6/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/6/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alejandro Diaz on 06/06/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alejandro Diaz as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/09/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketExhibit List AND WITNESS LIST; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Juan Reyes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Juan Reyes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Reyes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandro Diaz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08278    Hearing Date: October 24, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Alejandro Diaz’s Motion Compelling Defendant Juan Reyes To Respond To Special Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. RESPONSES ARE TO BE SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS AND SANCTIONS OF $475.00 ARE TO BE PAID WITHIN 30 DAYS.

REQUEST FOR RELIEF: Compel Defendant to provide verified responses to the special interrogatories, without objections, and award Plaintiff sanctions. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290.)

OPPOSITION: None filed as of October 21, 2019.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Alejandro Diaz (“Plaintiff”) propounded Special Interrogatories, Set One, on Defendant Juan Reyes (“Defendant”) on July 1, 2019. (Motion, Mehrban Decl., ¶3 and Exh. 1.) To date, no verified responses have been served. (Id. at ¶4.)

There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290.) Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff is entitled to an order compelling Defendant to serve verified responses without objections.

Defendant’s failure to timely respond also constitutes a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of this motion. The request for sanctions is granted against Defendant in the amount of $475.00 based on one hour of attorney time billed at $475.00. (Motion, Mehrban Decl., ¶6.) The sanctions are to be paid within 30 days this order.

Alejandro Diaz’s Motion Compelling Defendant Juan Reyes To Respond To Special Interrogatories, Set One, and for Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED. RESPONSES ARE TO BE SERVED WITHIN 20 DAYS. SANCTIONS OF $475.00 ARE TO BE PAID WITHIN 30 DAYS.

Moving party to give notice.