This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2021 at 21:13:47 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA V VALDEZ VS PLANET CARS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 ALEJANDRA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VALDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4412

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ ALEJANDRA V

Defendants

THE GOLDEN1 CREDIT UNION

INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

PLANET CARS INC. DBA CASH OR FINANCE AUTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/22/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/22/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/22/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

5/22/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/6/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Stay the Action and Proceed to Arbitration and [Proposed] Order to Stay the Action and Arbitrate this Dispute

8/14/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Stay the Action and Proceed to Arbitration and [Proposed] Order to Stay the Action and Arbitrate this Dispute

Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

8/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 08/02/2021

8/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 08/02/2021

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/6/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why the Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Appear at the Post Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketAddress for Kasra Sadr (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Alejandra V Valdez on 05/22/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Alejandra V Valdez as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Why the Case Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Appear at the Post Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Post-Arbitration Status Conference) of 08/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 08/02/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alejandra V Valdez (Plaintiff); As to: International Fidelity Insurance Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/05/2020; Service Cost: 109.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Alejandra V Valdez (Plaintiff); As to: THE GOLDEN1 CREDIT UNION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/02/2020; Service Cost: 109.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandra V Valdez (Plaintiff); As to: PLANET CARS, INC. (Defendant); THE GOLDEN1 CREDIT UNION (Defendant); International Fidelity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alejandra V Valdez (Plaintiff); As to: PLANET CARS, INC. (Defendant); THE GOLDEN1 CREDIT UNION (Defendant); International Fidelity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandra V Valdez (Plaintiff); As to: PLANET CARS, INC. (Defendant); THE GOLDEN1 CREDIT UNION (Defendant); International Fidelity Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLANET CARS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GOLDEN 1 CREDIT UNION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SADR KASRA