This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 02:00:15 (UTC).

ALEJANDRA RODRIGUEZ VS DAVID MONTANTES

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 ALEJANDRA RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID MONTANTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9985

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ ALEJANDRA

Defendant

MONTANTES DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OAKES CONNOR

Other Attorneys

MELKONIAN LENA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/30/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

1/22/2021: Answer - Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/7/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Hearing05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: David Montantes (Defendant); As to: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David Montantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: David Montantes (Defendant); Service Date: 12/03/2020; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/31/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: David Montantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alejandra Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: David Montantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELKONIAN LENA