Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 12:24:13 (UTC).

ALEC BARTON VS LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 ALEC BARTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS W. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1754

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DOUGLAS W. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARTON ALEC

Defendant

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/4/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/23/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

12/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

12/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

12/17/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

11/24/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

12/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/2/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/24/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

11/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Alec Barton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alec Barton on 11/24/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Alec Barton as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alec Barton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Alec Barton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S28 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 10:00 AM at Department S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 03:00 PM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 10:00 AM at Department S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAddress for Alec Barton (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 03:00 PM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alec Barton (Plaintiff); As to: Loya Casualty Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant