This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 01:33:29 (UTC).

ALDERWOOD PROPERTIES LP VS PRUDENCIO, RAYMUNDO

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 ALDERWOOD PROPERTIES LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRUDENCIO, RAYMUNDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6285

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALDERWOOD PROPERTIES LP

Defendants

PRUDENCIO RAYMUNDO

PRUDENCIO EVA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY BRYAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEATH OF TIMOTHY B. LIEBAERT & DECLARATION OF H.G. LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • DocketOSC SET 05/06/13, 0830 AM, DEPT. NWP, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALDERWOOD PROPERTIES LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY B. LIEGAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.