Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 11:47:36 (UTC).

ALBERT WILLIAMS VS CLAUDIA DELGADO BERRONES

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 ALBERT WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLAUDIA DELGADO BERRONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2432

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS ALBERT

Los Angeles, CA 90008

Defendant

BERRONES CLAUDIA DELGADO DBA D'S AUTO

Los Angeles, CA 90003

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

1/30/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

1/30/2018: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 01/30/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Albert Williams against Defendant Claudia Delgado Berrones DBA D'S Auto on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Albert Williams on 12/20/2017 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $1,615.00.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Claudia Delgado Berrones DBA D'S Auto. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Claudia Delgado Berrones (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 01/08/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Albert Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Claudia Delgado Berrones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Albert Williams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less