This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 03:35:40 (UTC).

ALBERT B CARREON VS KENNETH LEE CARREON

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 ALBERT B CARREON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENNETH LEE CARREON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1451

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARREON ALBERT B

Defendant

CARREON KENNETH LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POWELL JOHN WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

CHEIFER SOLOMON

Other Attorneys

NOVAK LOUIS CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Objection (name extension) - Objection to Plaintiff's Separate Statement

1/19/2021: Objection (name extension) - Objection to Plaintiff's Separate Statement

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

1/19/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

1/19/2021: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Opposing Party's Evidence in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

1/19/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Opposing Party's Evidence in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/26/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Reply (name extension) - Reply MEMO TO DEFENADNT'S OPPOSITION TO MSJ

1/26/2021: Reply (name extension) - Reply MEMO TO DEFENADNT'S OPPOSITION TO MSJ

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

1/27/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

2/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 02/01/2021

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 02/01/2021

Separate Statement - Separate Statement

11/13/2020: Separate Statement - Separate Statement

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/13/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Answer - Answer

6/30/2020: Answer - Answer

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

4/2/2020: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/16/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/16/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/16/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 02/01/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 02/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/01/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 02/01/2021; Result Type to Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketReply MEMO TO DEFENADNT'S OPPOSITION TO MSJ; Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketObjection PLAINTIFF'S EVEDENTIARY OBJECTION; Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: John William Powell (Attorney); ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/22/2019; Service Cost: 82.80; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ALBERT B CARREON (Plaintiff); As to: KENNETH LEE CARREON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11451    Hearing Date: February 01, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Mon., February 1, 202 1 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Carreon v. Carreon COMPL. FILED: 12-16-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC11451 DISC. C/O: 05-15-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 05-30-21

TRIAL DATE: 06-14-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Albert B. Carreon

RESP. PARTY: Defendant Kenneth Lee Carreon

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

(CCP § 437c)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Albert B. Carreon’s Motion for Summary Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 75/80 Day Lapse (CCP 12c and 1005 (b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on January 19, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: Filed on January 26, 2021 [X] Late [ ] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On December 16, 2019, Plaintiff Albert Carreon (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for declaratory relief against Kenneth Lee Carreon (“Defendant”). Defendant filed his answer on June 30, 2020.

On November 13, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Summary Judgment (the “Motion”). Defendant filed an Opposition on January 19, 2021, and Plaintiff filed a Reply on January 26, 2021.

As an initial matter, the Court notes that pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 580, subdivision (b)(4), “[d]eclaratory relief, except as authorized by section 86,” is not permissible in a limited jurisdiction court. Section 86 permits an action for declaratory relief when it is brought by way of cross-complaint or when sought to conduct a trial after a nonbinding fee arbitration between an attorney and his client. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(7).) Neither applies here. Thus, the Court finds this case was incorrectly classified as a limited jurisdiction action.

Accordingly, the Court reclassifies this action to unlimited jurisdiction court on its own motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 403.040, subdivision (a). Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Albert B. Carreon’s Motion for Summary Judgment is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. The action is RECLASSIFIED as an unlimited jurisdiction case and is transferred to the transfer/reclassification desk for collection of fees and reassignment. Plaintiff is ordered to pay the reclassification fee within ten (10) days of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.