This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2019 at 01:54:11 (UTC).

ALAN DABACH VS CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 ALAN DABACH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0608

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DABACH ALAN

Defendant

CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

1/29/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1/29/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

1/29/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

3/7/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/11/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

4/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

4/23/2018: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/23/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Alan Dabach against Defendant Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Alan Dabach on 01/29/2018 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,115.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H updated: Result Date to 04/18/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 04/11/2018 10:15 AM at Department H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 10:15 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department H; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Alan Dabach (Plaintiff); As to: Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 03/07/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Alan Dabach (Plaintiff); As to: Calabasas Park Estates Owners Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALABASAS PARK ESTATES OWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant