This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2012 at 16:31:31 (UTC).

A.J. MORGAN & COMPANY, INC. VS. SAFAII, KOOROSH

Case Summary

On 02/23/2012 A J MORGAN COMPANY, INC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against SAFAII, KOOROSH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0137

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A.J. MORGAN & COMPANY INC. A CALIF. CORP.

Defendant

SAFAII KOOROSH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS P. BLOCK & ASSOCIATES - DENNIS P. BLOCK

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HOMAN TAGHDIRI - HOMAN TAGHDIRI ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2012
  • NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTSIN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF IN THE SUM OF$8,601.10; , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES INSUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # BH278865031 . MATTERSET FOR HEARING ON 08/29/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 410.00 FILED BY(SAFAII, KOOROSH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATIONTRIAL 4/20/12 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/20/12AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TORESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (SAFAII, KOOROSH) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: TO ADVANCE HEARING ON DEMURRERTO MARCH 16,2012 FILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. 006 .RECEIPT # BH278865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • OPPOSITION RE: TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY (A.J.MORGAN & COMPANY, INC.) A CALIF. CORP. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. LESLIEE BROWN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTEAPPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE HEARING ONDEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTEREDAS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 ON03/16/12 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OFCOSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 305.00 , AND DECLARATON OFNON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (A.J. MORGAN & COMPANY, INC.) A CALIF.CORP. IN THE SUM OF $ 155.00 FOR BALANCE OF COMPLAINTFILING FEE . RECEIPT # BH451225008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (A.J. MORGAN & COMPANY, INC.) ACALIF. CORP. FOR REJECTION OF THIS IS NOT A REJECT BUT ANOTICE TO COMPLY: CORRECT FILING FEE FOR UNLAWFULDETAINER OVER $10,000 IS $385.00. YOU PAID ONLY $240.00,A BALANCE OF $155.00 IS DUE. PLEASE PAY UPON IMMEDIATERECEIPT OF THIS NOTICE TO MY ATTENTION. THANKS. SUBMITTEDON02/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILEDBY (SAFAII, KOOROSH) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON04/10/12 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. 006 . RECEIPT #BH278865032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • REQUEST RE: FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'SDEMURRER TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RECEIPT # BH451225010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less