This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 01:21:00 (UTC).

AGUILAR, ALBERT A VS SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 AGUILAR, ALBERT A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7201

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR ALBERT A

Defendant

SPRINGSTEED RICHARD E

 

Court Documents

Request for Certified Mail - Electronic

10/13/2015: Request for Certified Mail - Electronic

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/13/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Request (name extension)

10/13/2015: Request (name extension)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

12/24/2015: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

3/9/2016: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Before Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/23/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Small Claims Settlement Agreement

7/7/2016: Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/7/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/07/2016

7/7/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 07/07/2016

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

7/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer

7/29/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Order on Request for Court Order

8/17/2016: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

8/24/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

10/5/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

10/5/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/19/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/07/2016

6/7/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 06/07/2016

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/7/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request for Court Order: Result: Result Date: 10/05/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 10/05/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 10/05/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff (AGUILAR, ALBERT A) against Defendant (SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E) on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by AGUILAR, ALBERT A on 10/13/2015 (from ALH15G07201) for the principal amount of $1,295.00 and costs of $0.00 for a total of $1,295.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketDismissal entered on 07/07/2016, as to entire action is Vacated - .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketCase reassigned to Hon. at in effective 08/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/07/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/07/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED (1ST RESET) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketMATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 03/10/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E) . RECEIPT # 151012000516 . CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT: 70132630000006895879

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1151013E6740. HEARING SET FOR 12/24/15 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketCOPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (SPRINGSTEED, RICHARD E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketREQUEST RE: CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.