Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 12:34:57 (UTC).

AERIAL1 LLC VS HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2016 AERIAL1 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5487

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AERIAL1 LLC

Defendants

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC.

AVILES HENRY

AVILES BENNY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)

11/29/2016: Request for Dismissal - (With Prejudice)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/7/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/7/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/7/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (With Prejudice); Filed by: Aerial1 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1161109E2834 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161109E2834 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/03/2017 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Aerial1 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Horizon Real Estate Management, Inc. (Defendant); Henry Aviles (Defendant); Benny Aviles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant