This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2019 at 12:14:40 (UTC).

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC VS HEALTH CARE LA, IPA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HEALTH CARE LA, IPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2761

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC

Defendant

HEALTH CARE LA IPA

 

Court Documents

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/28/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

10/31/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Notice of Rejection]

10/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Notice of Rejection]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

10/31/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/12/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

11/12/2019: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • Hearing01/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant) to Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2019 at 04:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01/02/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims): As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims), Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Maybe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2019 at 04:30 PM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Advanced Orthopedic Center Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Health Care LA, IPA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH CARE LA IPA is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED ORTHOPEDIC CENTER INC is a litigant