This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/26/2016 at 08:45:39 (UTC).

ADVANCED AMERICAN LABORATORIES VS VORTEX RESTORATION

Case Summary

On 06/14/2013 ADVANCED AMERICAN LABORATORIES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VORTEX RESTORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH SALTSMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4573

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH SALTSMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED AMERICAN LABORATORIES

Defendant

VORTEX RESTORATION DBA LA OC RESTORATION INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY PARTIALLY SATISFIED AS FOLLOWS: $ 25.00 APPLIED TO COST OF WRIT AND TO ACCRUED INTEREST {LINES 16 & 17}. $ 47.60 APPLIED TO COLLECTION OF DAILY INTEREST {LINE 19}. $ 992.40 APPLIED TO THE JUDGMENT {LINE 15}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. US MAIL . RECEIPT # LAV485216005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/29/13 . FOR (ADVANCED AMERICAN LABORATORIES) . AGAINST (VORTEX RESTORATION) DBA (LA OC RESTORATION INC) . PRINCIPAL $ 1000.00 . COSTS $ 40.00 . TOTAL $ 1040.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/29/13 AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (VORTEX RESTORATION) DBA (LA OC RESTORATION INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. RALPH SALTSMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (VORTEX RESTORATION) DBA (LA OC RESTORATION INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/29/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (VORTEX RESTORATION) DBA (LA OC RESTORATION INC) . RECEIPT # E FILE . 7010 2780 0000 0103 0319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1130625E3913 . HEARING SET FOR 08/29/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (VORTEX RESTORATION) DBA (LA OC RESTORATION INC)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED AMERICAN LABORATORIES is a litigant